NY S06401 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.150
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.150
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits 4-H certified shooting sports instructors to supervise and instruct persons under sixteen years of age at shooting ranges.
Title
Permits 4-H certified shooting sports instructors to supervise and instruct persons under sixteen years of age at shooting ranges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.150 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.370 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6401B |
2020-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8078c |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8078b |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.308 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.419 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.419 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Senate | print number 8078a |
2019-06-06 | Senate | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-05-31 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-07-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8078C |
2020-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Senate | AMENDED 6401B |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.370 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6401A |
2020-02-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08078 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.150