NY S06408 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - PRINT NUMBER 6408B
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - PRINT NUMBER 6408B
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a uniform process for considering applications to purchase condominiums or cooperatives.
Title
Requires a uniform process for considering applications to purchase condominiums or cooperatives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6408B |
2020-07-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6408A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01267 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - amended on third reading 1267d