NY S06421 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - SIGNED CHAP.42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - SIGNED CHAP.42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to party committee meeting and organization requirements including meeting times and the election of a chairman, a secretary, a treasurer and any other officers needed pursuant to applicable rules.
Title
Relates to party committee meeting and organization requirements including meeting times and the election of a chairman, a secretary, a treasurer and any other officers needed pursuant to applicable rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.42 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.433 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8227b |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1719 |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6421B |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6421A |
2019-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08227 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - SIGNED CHAP.42