NY S06423 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.335
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.335
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to orders for temporary spousal support in conjunction with temporary and final orders of protection in family court and calculation of maintenance cap in family and supreme court; increases the income cap.
Title
Relates to orders for temporary spousal support in conjunction with temporary and final orders of protection in family court and calculation of maintenance cap in family and supreme court; increases the income cap.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.335 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.557 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7529a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1630 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07529 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.335