NY S06424 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7265A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7265A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a comprehensive centralized system to coordinate procurement of books and non-print library materials and related ancillary services.
Title
Establishes a comprehensive centralized system to coordinate procurement of books and non-print library materials and related ancillary services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7265A |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1342 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6424A |
2018-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07265 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - tabled