NY S06428 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the establishment of a sexual assault victim bill of rights by the department of health, in consultation with the division of criminal justice services and the office of victim services; establishes a victim's right to notice.
Title
Provides for the establishment of a sexual assault victim bill of rights by the department of health, in consultation with the division of criminal justice services and the office of victim services; establishes a victim's right to notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6428C |
2018-05-31 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6428B |
2018-01-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6428A |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.156 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1165 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08401 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - signed chap.407