NY S06441 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.289
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.289
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Ithaca, county of Tompkins, to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parklands.
Title
Authorizes the town of Ithaca, county of Tompkins, to alienate and convey certain parcels of land used as parklands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.289 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1834 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6441 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.478 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.478 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-10 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8235 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1834 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08235 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.289