NY S06448 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes human research in compliance with federal law.
Title
Authorizes human research in compliance with federal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.309 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.429 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a8125 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1465 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08125 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.309