NY S06457 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an electronic personal voter registration process integrated within designated agency applications; requires the state board of elections to promulgate necessary rules and regulations; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an electronic personal voter registration process integrated within designated agency applications; requires the state board of elections to promulgate necessary rules and regulations; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-20SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-20Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-20AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1635
2019-06-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 6457A
2019-06-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2019-06-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08280 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - rules report cal.678

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback