NY S06506 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of mental health to conduct a study on the suicide rates of taxi medallion holders and taxi drivers in the state and make a report and recommendations on the findings of such study within one year.
Title
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of mental health to conduct a study on the suicide rates of taxi medallion holders and taxi drivers in the state and make a report and recommendations on the findings of such study within one year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.615 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08589 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to mental health