NY S06525 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the village of Mastic Beach entering into contracts to sell delinquent tax liens.
Title
Relates to the village of Mastic Beach entering into contracts to sell delinquent tax liens.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Zeldin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-03-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6525A |
2014-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.228 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |