NY S06525 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits video lottery gaming in the town of Woodbury, Orange county; designates vendor fees; requires a mitigation agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits video lottery gaming in the town of Woodbury, Orange county; designates vendor fees; requires a mitigation agreement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1732
2019-06-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 6525B
2019-06-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2019-06-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 6525A
2019-06-15SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2019-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08417 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - print number 8417a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback