NY S06526 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.215
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.215
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates state route 60 in the city of Jamestown, county of Chautauqua, as the "Private Charles S. Cooper, Jr. Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates state route 60 in the city of Jamestown, county of Chautauqua, as the "Private Charles S. Cooper, Jr. Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.215 |
2019-08-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.684 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a5575a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1651 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6526A |
2019-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
S00881 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
A05575 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.215
A05575 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.215