NY S06532 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - SIGNED CHAP.316
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - SIGNED CHAP.316
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any change of enrollment after February fourteenth shall take effect seven days after the succeeding June primary.
Title
Provides that any change of enrollment after February fourteenth shall take effect seven days after the succeeding June primary.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-26 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.316 |
2019-09-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.434 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8228b |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1670 |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6532A |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08228 (Same As) 2019-09-26 - SIGNED CHAP.316