NY S06533 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the video recording of interrogations of juveniles in juvenile delinquency proceedings in family court.
Title
Relates to requiring the video recording of interrogations of juveniles in juvenile delinquency proceedings in family court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.299 |
2020-11-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.300 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted for a7970 |
2020-03-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-03-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.476 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1734 |
2019-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07970 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.299