NY S06535 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permanency planning in juvenile delinquency and persons in need of supervision proceedings in family court.
Title
Relates to permanency planning in juvenile delinquency and persons in need of supervision proceedings in family court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-13 | Senate | vetoed memo.202 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1736 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6535 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.410 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.410 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-29 | Senate | referred to children and families |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7940 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1736 |
2019-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07940 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - tabled