NY S06550 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to proceedings against juvenile and adolescent offenders and allowing district attorneys to remove such offenders to family court.
Title
Relates to proceedings against juvenile and adolescent offenders and allowing district attorneys to remove such offenders to family court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.240 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.534 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8315 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1741 |
2019-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08315 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.240