NY S06567 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - POCKET VETO - VETO.296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - POCKET VETO - VETO.296
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the payment of prevailing wages of affected employees of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant; requires the department of labor to oversee sale and the hiring of new employees at such power plant.
Title
Requires the payment of prevailing wages of affected employees of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant; requires the department of labor to oversee sale and the hiring of new employees at such power plant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Assembly | POCKET VETO - VETO.296 |
2019-12-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.652 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7569b |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1746 |
2019-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07569 (Same As) 2021-01-22 - POCKET VETO - VETO.296