NY S06575 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - signed chap.96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - signed chap.96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to minority and women business enterprises; extends the provisions of article 15-a of the executive law; provides for punishment for fraud related to minority and women business enterprises (Part ).
Title
Relates to minority and women business enterprises; extends the provisions of article 15-a of the executive law; provides for punishment for fraud related to minority and women business enterprises (Part ).
Sponsors
Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | signed chap.96 |
2019-07-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1661 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6575 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.578 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | rules report cal.578 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-18 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-16 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8414 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1661 |
2019-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08414 (Same As) 2019-07-15 - signed chap.96