NY S06587 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 6587A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 6587A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a clean and resilient energy program to encourage the development of clean and resilient behind the meter distributed energy resource projects.
Title
Establishes a clean and resilient energy program to encourage the development of clean and resilient behind the meter distributed energy resource projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6587A |
2020-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08240 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - print number 8240a