NY S06597 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8382B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8382B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires immediate notification by law enforcement of the filing of an accusatory instrument alleging a sex offense by an employee; provides that no cause of action against law enforcement or school district shall exist for damages related to the dissemination of criminal history or arrest records.
Title
Requires immediate notification by law enforcement of the filing of an accusatory instrument alleging a sex offense by an employee; provides that no cause of action against law enforcement or school district shall exist for damages related to the dissemination of criminal history or arrest records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8382B |
2018-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6597B |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1455 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6597A |
2018-02-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08382 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.233