NY S06597 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - VETOED MEMO.288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - VETOED MEMO.288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to making technical corrections relating to bicycles with electric assist and electric scooters.
Title
Relates to making technical corrections relating to bicycles with electric assist and electric scooters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.288 |
2019-12-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.671 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8430 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1666 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08430 (Same As) 2019-12-26 - VETOED MEMO.288