NY S06598 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Great Valley creek and its tributaries as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates Great Valley creek and its tributaries as inland waterways for purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1750 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A08355 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.232