NY S06599 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the New York state climate leadership and community protection act; relates to climate change; renewable energy program; labor and job standards and worker protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the New York state climate leadership and community protection act; relates to climate change; renewable energy program; labor and job standards and worker protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblymessage of necessity - 3 day message
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.634
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a8429
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18SenateMESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE
2019-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1622
2019-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08429 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s6599

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback