NY S06605 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-15 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of supreme court judges and county court judges in certain jurisdictions.
Title
Increases the number of supreme court judges and county court judges in certain jurisdictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08425 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - enacting clause stricken