NY S06622 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.265
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the liability of design professionals; prohibits broad indemnification of a state or local agency or political subdivision involving public work for contracts executed on or after January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the liability of design professionals; prohibits broad indemnification of a state or local agency or political subdivision involving public work for contracts executed on or after January 1, 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17AssemblyVETOED MEMO.265
2018-08-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.445
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8293a
2018-06-14Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1792
2018-06-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 6622A
2018-05-24SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-06-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08293 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6622a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback