NY S06634 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.431
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the state commissioner of transportation to convey certain real property to the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the state commissioner of transportation to convey certain real property to the town of Huntington, county of Suffolk.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.431
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.426
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a11021
2018-06-13Assemblyreferred to transportation
2018-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-13SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2018-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1721
2018-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2017-06-08SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08413 (Same As) 2017-06-14 - referred to transportation
A11021 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6634

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback