NY S06641 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to menacing a police officer or peace officer.
Title
Relates to menacing a police officer or peace officer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-02-24 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-07-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08527 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes