NY S06647 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the gaming commission may, at its discretion, authorize an increase to the limitation for individual video lottery facilities upon illustration of benefit to the state.
Title
Provides that the gaming commission may, at its discretion, authorize an increase to the limitation for individual video lottery facilities upon illustration of benefit to the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2050 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6647B |
2018-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-02-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6647A |
2018-02-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2017-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09526 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - print number 9526b