NY S06650 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.432
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.432
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the superintendent to develop a public information campaign regarding establishment of joint deposit and convenience accounts.
Title
Directs the superintendent to develop a public information campaign regarding establishment of joint deposit and convenience accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.432 |
2018-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.198 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a10905 |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1138 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1577 |
2017-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10905 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - substituted by s6650