NY S06653 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary New York craft beverage permit for all New York state manufactured liquor, spirits, wine, beer, cider and mead for events located in a municipality with a population of less than one million.
Title
Establishes a temporary New York craft beverage permit for all New York state manufactured liquor, spirits, wine, beer, cider and mead for events located in a municipality with a population of less than one million.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] |
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2020-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.477 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-08-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10066 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - referred to economic development