NY S06655 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.314
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of health to post on its website information relating to emerging contaminant notification levels and educational materials relating thereto.
Title
Directs the department of health to post on its website information relating to emerging contaminant notification levels and educational materials relating thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.314 |
2018-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.135 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | substituted for a10927 |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
2018-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1030 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1974 |
2017-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10927 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - substituted by s6655