NY S06658 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.237
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.237
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the second Monday in July each year as a day of commemoration, to be known as Abolition Commemoration day.
Title
Designates the second Monday in July each year as a day of commemoration, to be known as Abolition Commemoration day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.237 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.348 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | substituted for a10831 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.802 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6658B |
2020-07-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-07-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6658A |
2020-07-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-08-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08531 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - advanced to third reading cal.337
A10831 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.237
A10831 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.237