NY S06665 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - signed chap.204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to domestic violence-related activity of the New York state office for the prevention of domestic violence; adds a member to the advisory council.
Title
Relates to domestic violence-related activity of the New York state office for the prevention of domestic violence; adds a member to the advisory council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Senate | signed chap.204 |
2020-09-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.803 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6665 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.304 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.214 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | rules report cal.214 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8023 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.803 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2019-08-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08023 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - signed chap.204