NY S06676 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on August 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a uniform metric for measuring noise impacts that will be used by airports for the purpose of noise exposure maps and noise compatibility programs.
Title
Relates to establishing a uniform metric for measuring noise impacts that will be used by airports for the purpose of noise exposure maps and noise compatibility programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.266 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-08-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A03063 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health