NY S06679 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of intoxication of the victim as a defense in sex crimes; amends the definition of "mentally incapacitated" to include persons who are voluntarily intoxicated.
Title
Prohibits the use of intoxication of the victim as a defense in sex crimes; amends the definition of "mentally incapacitated" to include persons who are voluntarily intoxicated.
Sponsors
Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6679C |
2020-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.372 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-12-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6679B |
2019-12-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-10-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6679A |
2019-10-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-08-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08634 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - print number 8634c