NY S06697 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of electronic liquid, liquid nicotine, or e-liquid used to refill electronic cigarettes or electronic cigarette cartridges.
Title
Prohibits the sale of electronic liquid, liquid nicotine, or e-liquid used to refill electronic cigarettes or electronic cigarette cartridges.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6697A |
2020-01-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-09-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |