NY S06698 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to inheritance by children conceived after the death of a genetic parent; provides that a genetic child is a distributee of his or her genetic parent if, absent clear and convincing evidence of a contrary intention of the deceased genetic parent, it is established that the person giving birth to the child is the surviving spouse of the genetic parent; the genetic material was collected after the genetic parent's death; and at the time of the genetic parent's death no divorce proceeding was pending.
Title
Relates to inheritance by children conceived after the death of a genetic parent; provides that a genetic child is a distributee of his or her genetic parent if, absent clear and convincing evidence of a contrary intention of the deceased genetic parent, it is established that the person giving birth to the child is the surviving spouse of the genetic parent; the genetic material was collected after the genetic parent's death; and at the time of the genetic parent's death no divorce proceeding was pending.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.149 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-09-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08598 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to judiciary