NY S06707 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - approval memo.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - approval memo.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health of the state of New York to conduct a study of the effects of racial and ethnic disparities on breastfeeding rates and prepare and submit a report to the governor and the legislature.
Title
Requires the department of health of the state of New York to conduct a study of the effects of racial and ethnic disparities on breastfeeding rates and prepare and submit a report to the governor and the legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | approval memo.20 |
2020-12-02 | Senate | signed chap.308 |
2020-11-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-03-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.479 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6707 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.251 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.383 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.383 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-28 | Senate | print number 6986a |
2019-05-28 | Senate | amend and recommit to health |
2019-04-03 | Senate | referred to health |
2020-03-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6986A |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.479 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-02-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2019-09-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A06986 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - approval memo.20