NY S06713 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the division of human rights to promulgate a statement regarding housing discrimination that shall be appended to any form of housing assistance to inform recipients of such assistance about what statements and actions may be considered illegal discrimination based on lawful source of income.
Title
Directs the division of human rights to promulgate a statement regarding housing discrimination that shall be appended to any form of housing assistance to inform recipients of such assistance about what statements and actions may be considered illegal discrimination based on lawful source of income.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.412 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-09-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08389 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations