NY S06722 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enacting the "New York collegiate athletic participation compensation act"; allows student-athletes to receive compensation including for the use of a student's name, image or likeness; allows student athletes to seek professional representation; requires colleges to establish a sports injury health savings account to provide compensation to athletes for career ending or long-term injuries; requires colleges to establish a wage fund to be paid out to all student-athletes attending the college; requires colleges to take fifteen percent of revenue earned from athletics ticket sales and divide such revenue among student-athletes; establishes the community college athlete name, image and likeness working group.
Title
Relates to enacting the "New York collegiate athletic participation compensation act"; allows student-athletes to receive compensation including for the use of a student's name, image or likeness; allows student athletes to seek professional representation; requires colleges to establish a sports injury health savings account to provide compensation to athletes for career ending or long-term injuries; requires colleges to establish a wage fund to be paid out to all student-athletes attending the college; requires colleges to take fifteen percent of revenue earned from athletics ticket sales and divide such revenue among student-athletes; establishes the community college athlete name, image and likeness working group.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-10-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6722B |
2019-10-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-09-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6722A |
2019-09-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-09-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08620 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education