NY S06724 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that for taxable years beginning on or after January first, two thousand nineteen, a qualified taxpayer will be able to claim a refundable credit up to two hundred fifty dollars for eligible losses incurred from the interruption in the payment of their wages or salary due to an action by a payroll service company; defines terms; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides that for taxable years beginning on or after January first, two thousand nineteen, a qualified taxpayer will be able to claim a refundable credit up to two hundred fifty dollars for eligible losses incurred from the interruption in the payment of their wages or salary due to an action by a payroll service company; defines terms; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.254 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6724A |
2020-01-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-09-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |