NY S06727 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the liability of payroll processing companies; provides that payroll processing companies that intentionally and wrongfully prevent the distribution of payroll shall be liable to employees that failed to receive an expected payment for an amount up to three times the expected amount; and provides an action to recover damages may be maintained as a class action.
Title
Relates to the liability of payroll processing companies; provides that payroll processing companies that intentionally and wrongfully prevent the distribution of payroll shall be liable to employees that failed to receive an expected payment for an amount up to three times the expected amount; and provides an action to recover damages may be maintained as a class action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2020-01-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6727B |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.150 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6727A |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-09-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08653 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to judiciary