NY S06728 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of financial services, in consultation with the department of taxation and finance, to conduct a study regarding insurance or other risk mitigation tools and third-party payroll service providers; provides that the superintendent of financial services shall submit a report to the governor, the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly of the department's findings, conclusions, and recommendations.
Title
Requires the department of financial services, in consultation with the department of taxation and finance, to conduct a study regarding insurance or other risk mitigation tools and third-party payroll service providers; provides that the superintendent of financial services shall submit a report to the governor, the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly of the department's findings, conclusions, and recommendations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2020-01-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.73 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-09-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |