NY S06745 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the state of New York a purple heart state.
Title
Designates the state of New York a purple heart state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-09-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10598 (Same As) 2020-06-05 - referred to governmental operations