NY S06757 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-28 - PRINT NUMBER 6757A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-28 - PRINT NUMBER 6757A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to medical billing and debt (Part A); relates to defining certain terms (Part B); relates to standardized consolidated itemized general hospital bills (Part C); relates to regulation of the billing of facility fees (Part D); relates to standardized patient financial liability forms (Part E); relates to an all payer database (Part F); relates to the general hospital indigent care pool; and repeals certain provisions of such law relating thereto (Part G); relates to the rate of interest in medical debt actions (Part H); relates to services rendered by a non-participating provider; relates to hospital statements of rights and responsibilities of patients (Part I).
Title
Relates to medical billing and debt (Part A); relates to defining certain terms (Part B); relates to standardized consolidated itemized general hospital bills (Part C); relates to regulation of the billing of facility fees (Part D); relates to standardized patient financial liability forms (Part E); relates to an all payer database (Part F); relates to the general hospital indigent care pool; and repeals certain provisions of such law relating thereto (Part G); relates to the rate of interest in medical debt actions (Part H); relates to services rendered by a non-participating provider; relates to hospital statements of rights and responsibilities of patients (Part I).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6757A |
2020-09-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-09-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08639 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - print number 8639a