NY S06758 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the disposal of construction and demolition waste; provides penalties for the unlawful disposal and dealing in construction and demolition wastes; requires waste tracking documents for the disposal of construction and demolition waste; creates the crime of scheme to defraud by disposal of solid waste.
Title
Relates to the disposal of construction and demolition waste; provides penalties for the unlawful disposal and dealing in construction and demolition wastes; requires waste tracking documents for the disposal of construction and demolition waste; creates the crime of scheme to defraud by disposal of solid waste.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | approval memo.38 |
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.332 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1007 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6758B |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.296 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | rules report cal.296 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | reported |
2020-07-20 | Senate | print number 10803a |
2020-07-20 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2020-07-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-11 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10803A |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1007 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6758B |
2020-07-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6758A |
2020-03-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-10-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |