NY S06766 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits public display of tobacco advertisements and smoking paraphernalia within five hundred feet of schools; imposes a maximum penalty of five hundred dollars per violation; exempts tobacco businesses from the prohibition.
Title
Prohibits public display of tobacco advertisements and smoking paraphernalia within five hundred feet of schools; imposes a maximum penalty of five hundred dollars per violation; exempts tobacco businesses from the prohibition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-12-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6766A |
2019-12-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-10-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A02763 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - print number 2763a