NY S06768 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.185
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.185
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the Village of Port Dickinson Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.
Title
Exempts the Village of Port Dickinson Fire Department from the requirement that the percentage of non-resident fire department members not exceed forty-five percent of the membership.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.185 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.76 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a8695a |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.695 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6768A |
2020-05-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-10-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08695 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.185