NY S06793 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 6793A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 6793A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires members of the metropolitan transportation authority police force to wear body cameras and for such camera to be on at all times during the officer's shift; directs the chief of the metropolitan transportation authority police force to promulgate rules and regulations pertaining to such body cameras.
Title
Requires members of the metropolitan transportation authority police force to wear body cameras and for such camera to be on at all times during the officer's shift; directs the chief of the metropolitan transportation authority police force to promulgate rules and regulations pertaining to such body cameras.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica Ramos [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6793A |
2020-03-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-10-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08943 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - print number 8943a